U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54626-sms
  • Case Name: Raymond Lamar Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Employer Deduction Order]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Chapter 13 Auto Assignment]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [02g-Order Granting Application (Paid in Installments)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Payment Advices]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.