U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10613
  • Case Name: SCV Graphic Productions, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [0-Change of Address (document requesting)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time, Motion to]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [0-Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [06-Motion to Extend Time]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Pay Pre-Petition Claims, Motion to]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order and Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts, Motion to ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [0-Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice (BK)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [0-Certificate of Service]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order and Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Pay Pre-Petition Claims, Motion to]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Request for Expedited Consideration of Certain First Day Matters (Complex Ch. 11)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Pay Pre-Petition Claims, Motion to]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve Use of Cash Collateral, Motion to]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Authorize Use of Existing Bank Accounts, Motion to]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [P-Corporate Resolution]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [P-Amendment to Voluntary Petition]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Miscellaneous Deficiencies]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.