U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54653-sms
  • Case Name: Adaugo Queen Ohandjo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Chapter 13 Monthly Income Statement/Calculation of Disposable Income Document(s) - (122C-1/122C-2)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule J]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule I]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Declaration of Debtor]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule H]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule G]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule E/F]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule D]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule C]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [P-Schedule A/B]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Individual]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Chapter 13 Auto Assignment]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Pro Se Affidavit]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pro Se Affidavit]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.