U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-51296-jwc
  • Case Name: Jeffrey Deandrea Dewberry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule J]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule I]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Employer Deduction Order]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Confirmation Hearing Rescheduled]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Affidavit]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [0-Withdrawal of Document]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Amendment to Voluntary Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.