U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-70463
  • Case Name: Willie L. Pettiford
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeLoach, Jonathan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeLoach, Jonathan W. [Installment Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeLoach, Jonathan W. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeLoach, Jonathan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeLoach, Jonathan W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeLoach, Jonathan W. [Payroll Deduction]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeLoach, Jonathan W. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeLoach, Jonathan W. [Meeting of Creditors 13 (Auto Assign)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeLoach, Jonathan W. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.