U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54789
  • Case Name: Marston Lawrence Tolin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income/Means Test Document(s) - (Forms 122A-1, 122A-1Supp, 122A-2)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Attorney Disclosure Statement]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Statement of Intention]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule J]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule I]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule H]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule G]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule E/F]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule D]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule C]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Schedule A/B]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Individual]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Chapter 7 Auto Assignment]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Payment Advices]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Cooper, Kyle A. [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.