U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54863-jwc
  • Case Name: Stephen Howard Foster
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Hearing/Rescheduled Hearing (BK)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Order and Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Stay Proceedings, Motion to]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Impose Stay, Motion to]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Complaint]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Denying Application to Pay Filing Fees In Installments (531)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding List of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Individual]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Notice (BK)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Chapter 7 Auto Assignment]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Order Regarding List of Creditors]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [02d-Order Denying Application to Pay in Installments (10-day)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Pro Se Affidavit]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pro Se Affidavit]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gordon, Neil C. [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.