U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-54854-sms
  • Case Name: Casandra Marie Carter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [04-Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Employer Deduction Order]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Manner of Service Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Autodocket of Credit Card]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Notice to Debtor Regarding Debtor Electronic Noticing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Chapter 13 Auto Assignment]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Payment Advices]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Safir, K. Edward [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.