open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-04747
    Party Name:RICARD v. GEO GROUP, INC. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Pretrial Schedule and Discussing Discovery in Prisoner Litigation]
    Date Published:April 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Lawsuit & Waiver Issued by Clerk]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Pro se Litigant]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118354
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =