U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mj-00325-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JORDAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Readiness for Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Penalty Sheet]
  • April 01, 2025: [Complaint & Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.