U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-00047-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Alvarez-Reyes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 18, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 14, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 14, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas corpus Ad Prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.