U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00291
  • Case Name: Campbell v. Hoyt Sherman Place Foundation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 19, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • June 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • May 29, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Stay]
  • April 22, 2020: [Stay]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 09, 2020: [Status Conference]
February, 2020
  • February 18, 2020: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • February 18, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 18, 2020: [Crossclaim]
  • February 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 22, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 22, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 22, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 21, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 21, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • January 02, 2020: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • December 20, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 19, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 01, 2019: [Order]
  • November 01, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • November 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • October 31, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2019: [Order]
  • October 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 17, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 16, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • September 12, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • September 12, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • September 11, 2019: [Certificate]
  • September 11, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.