U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10636
  • Case Name: Darren DesVeaux
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
January, 2018
  • January 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Schedules and Statements]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Change of Address]
  • November 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Declaration]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Order to Comply]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.