U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10643
  • Case Name: Charlene Tiffany Luczko
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order on Objection to Claim of Exempt Property]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.