U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-20197
  • Case Name: Timothy P Richter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
March, 2018
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharge]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Request for Discharge]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.