U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-20606
  • Case Name: Peter C. Warren and Diane L. Warren
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • July 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sell]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reply]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sell]
March, 2018
  • March 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Suggestion of Death]
  • February 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.