U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10640
  • Case Name: Justin E. Goodnow
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
April, 2018
  • April 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Employ]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Employ]
  • April 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Avoid or strip Lien]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Consent]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Withdraw Document]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Withdraw Document]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Objection to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Objection]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Change of Address]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.