U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-20612
  • Case Name: Shalene K Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Withdraw Document]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approve Loan Modification]
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Approve Loan Modification]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approve Loan Modification]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Approve Loan Modification]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • May 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Minutes of Proceedings]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Objection]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Continue Hearing]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Continue Hearing]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Relief from Stay]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Relief from Stay]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Consent]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Relief from Stay]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Compensation]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Amended Notice of Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Certificate of Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Proposed Order]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Compensation]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Extend Time]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Extend Time]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Hearing Set]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Withdraw Document]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Withdraw Document]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Administrative Expenses]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Administrative Expenses]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Change of Address]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Hearing Set]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Administrative Expenses]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Administrative Expenses]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Entry]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [File Tax Returns]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [File Tax Returns]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Converting Case to Chapter 11/12/13]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Converting Case to Chapter 11/12/13]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Agreed Request for Continuance]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Hearing Set]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Objection]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Objection]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Change of Address]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Certificate of Service]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Convert Case 07 to 13]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Convert Case 07 to 13]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jeffrey, T. Piampiano as Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of Sashay, LLC [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Withdraw Document]
  • April 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • April 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Pay]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Pay ]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Objection]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
February, 2018
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Sell]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Objection]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Employ]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Consent]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedules and Statements]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.