U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-20442
  • Case Name: Parkview Adventist Medical Center and Priority Holdings, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Adversary Case]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.