U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-02009
  • Case Name: Frohock, as Liquidating Trustee of the Parkview Li v. 3M Company
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • January 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Dismissing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 09, 2017: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 07, 2017: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Sua Sponte Order]
November, 2017
  • November 18, 2017: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 16, 2017: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
  • November 16, 2017: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.