U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-20623
  • Case Name: Cindy J. Kilburn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Avoid or strip Lien]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedules and Statements]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.