U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10659
  • Case Name: Pierre J. Gagne and Carrie J. Smith-Gagne
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Vacating Order]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
January, 2018
  • January 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.