U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-20625
  • Case Name: James Michael Malloy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Avoid or strip Lien]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • February 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • February 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement Cover Sheet]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Schedules and Statements]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order to Comply]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.