U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10661
  • Case Name: Kris Anne Beaton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • November 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.