U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10660
  • Case Name: Peter C. Kennedy and Linda H. Kennedy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
April, 2018
  • April 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Entry]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Change of Address]
  • November 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.