U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-20633
  • Case Name: Birch Ridge Limited Partnership
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Consent]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Dismiss Case]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Mediation Held]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Document]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Mediation Set]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Sua Sponte Order]
  • February 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Referral for Mediation Order]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Sua Sponte Order]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Response]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Schedules and Statements]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Equity Security Holders]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Order]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Reply]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Document]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Witness List]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 10, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Expedite Hearing]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Adequate Protection]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Change of Address]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Exhibit]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order to Comply]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Matrix]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Entry]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Affidavit]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Assume/Reject]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [20 Largest Unsecured Creditors]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.