U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10674
  • Case Name: Ralph E Porter, Jr. and Amy R Porter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Sell]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Supplemental Document]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Expedite Hearing]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Defer Payment]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Employ]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Defer Fee]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Sell]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Employ]
February, 2019
  • February 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.