U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-10441
  • Case Name: Scott R Murphy and Sherry A Murphy
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • January 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Document]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • December 26, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharge]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Request for Discharge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.