U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10683
  • Case Name: Jocelyn Ghislain Pelletier and Virginia Ann Pelletier
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 17, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.