U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10687
  • Case Name: Brad Vaughan Bragg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Approving Final Report & Account]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Distribution]
November, 2018
  • November 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
May, 2018
  • May 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
December, 2017
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.