U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10686
  • Case Name: Jill S. Hunter-Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Application for Redaction of Personal Identifiers (Fee Per Case)]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Application for Redaction of Personal Identifiers (Fee Per Case)]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
December, 2017
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Change of Address]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.