U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10685
  • Case Name: Jerry R. Couture, Sr. and Eileen Noella Couture
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.