U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-20715
  • Case Name: Timothy C. Hall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • November 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Consent]
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Distribution]
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Concerning Claims]
  • March 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Order Concerning Claims]
June, 2018
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • June 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Document]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Supplemental Document]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • February 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
January, 2018
  • January 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Convert Case 13 to 07]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Supplemental Document]
December, 2017
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Order on Severed Case]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sever Chapter 13 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.