U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-20645
  • Case Name: Julie A. Hall
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • February 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Entry]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Document]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Document]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order on Document]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Convert Case 13 to 07]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 03, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Severing Case]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Assign Judge and Trustee Special Event]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.