U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10694
  • Case Name: Allen Paul Daigle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
March, 2018
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Fees Due]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Document]
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
December, 2017
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 10, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Matrix]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.