U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-20648
  • Case Name: Norman F. Henthorn, Jr. and Linda E. Henthorn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2018
  • October 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Final Report & Account]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Distribution]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Lease Assumption Agreement]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Consent]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 24, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Change of Address]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 05, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.