U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10705
  • Case Name: Lloyd Stalbaum and Wanda Stalbaum
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • February 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Document]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 09, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.