U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-20655
  • Case Name: Joy Lenore Treffeisen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • February 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Request for Change of Address]
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Document]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 10, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 10, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 08, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.