U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-20657
  • Case Name: Theriault Associates
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Final Report & Account]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Distribution]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Compromise Controversy]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Entry]
August, 2018
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Compromise Controversy]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • February 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Employ]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 18, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset Business]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 11, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.