U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-20569
  • Case Name: Angela K Pizzolato
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharge]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • March 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Request for Discharge]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.