U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10715
  • Case Name: Mynt Investments, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Compensation]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Compensation]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Employ]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Employ]
April, 2018
  • April 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Request for Change of Address]
  • March 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Sell]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Request for Change of Address]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • February 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Sell]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Employ]
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Proposed Order]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Employ]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Schedules and Statements]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Change of Address]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Order to Comply]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset Business]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.