U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10719
  • Case Name: Christopher R Betts and Nicole A Betts
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Final Report & Account]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Distribution]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.