U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10718
  • Case Name: Daniel L Dugan and Susan T Dugan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 16, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Final Report & Account]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Distribution]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • March 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Avoid or strip Lien]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Avoid or Strip Lien]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Document]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.