U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10730
  • Case Name: Stephen Herbert Sullivan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Distribution]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • March 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • March 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • January 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • January 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Schedules and Statements]
December, 2017
  • December 24, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 22, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.