U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10737
  • Case Name: William T. Bormet, II and Tanya M. Bormet
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Approving Final Report & Account]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Distribution]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
April, 2018
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Request for Change of Address]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
December, 2017
  • December 30, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.