U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10741
  • Case Name: Dean J. Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Sell]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Defer Payment]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Defer Fee]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Sell]
September, 2018
  • September 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Proposed Order]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • April 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Extend Time]
February, 2018
  • February 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Request for Change of Address]
  • January 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.