U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-10740
  • Case Name: Steven J Zajicek and Jill M Zajicek
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Filing Fee Payment]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Fees Due]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Schedule E/F]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • March 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 28, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.