U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10003
  • Case Name: Lawrence W Robstock, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Compromise Controversy]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Compromise Controversy]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Distribution]
September, 2018
  • September 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2018
  • April 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Supplemental Document]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.