U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10009
  • Case Name: Alison M Felton
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Distribution]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
April, 2018
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • April 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
January, 2018
  • January 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.