U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20006
  • Case Name: Sandra E. Bortz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • January 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
April, 2018
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • April 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • January 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • January 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • January 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.